Church: Register of Elders of Forks of the Brandywine Manor Presbyterian Church:
Chester Co., PA
Contributed for use in USGenWeb Archives by Leslie <Harley1369@aol.com>.
******************************************************************
USGENWEB ARCHIVES NOTICE: Printing this file within by non-
commercial individuals and libraries is encouraged, as long as
all notices and submitter information is included. Any other use,
including copying files to other sites requires permission from
the submitters PRIOR to uploading to any other sites. We encourage
links to the state and county table of contents.
http://www.usgwarchives.net/
******************************************************************
The Register of Elders of Forks of the Brandywine Manor Presbyterian Church
Name When Ordained Dismissed or Died
or Installed Ceased to Act
Richard Templin 1884
James Lockhart
Joseph McClure Ceased to act Dec 9, 1825 Oct 15, 1827
William Denny
Joseph Grier Nov 10, 1830
James Ralston Nov 7, 1832
Matthew Stanley Dec 2, 1815 Ceased to act Jul 12, 1840 Jun 15, 1844
John Buchanan " " " Aug 22, 1856
William Templeton " " " Sept 2, 1849
Robert Ralston " " " Dis. to W. Chester 10/1833
John Templeton July 1825 Jul 27, 1865
Danl Kirkpatrick " " Sep 19, 1829
David Buchanan " " Feb 20, 1875
William Lockhart " "
Robert McIntire " "
Samuel Ralston 1830
John McClure " Dis. April 1839 Feb 9, 1873
James Long "
Joseph McClure "
John Ralston 1844 Apr 21, 1880
David Williams " Feb 7, 1849
William N. Long " Jul 13, 1862
Caleb Ligget " Mar 2, 1876
William Robison Aug 21, 1859 Nov 28, 1871
John Danman " " " Oct 6, 1871
James Ligget " " " Sep 19, 1894
John F. Templeton Inst'd June 6, 1869
Gordon Tulloch Dis. to Downingtown May 25, '71
Andrew Buchanan Aug 21, 1859 Dis. June 27, 1870 Oct 10, 1872
James King Grier " " " Jan 8, 1867
Baxter B. McClure Apr 8, 1877 Dis. May 24, 1881
Dr. N.G. Thompson " " "
John Weber " " " Jan 16, 1895
Benj. G. Rea " " " Dis. Mar 3, 1882 to Norristown
Lewis Worrall Jul 9, 1882 Downingtown Jun 1, 1844
F.H. Irwin " " "
Charles T. Forrest " " " May 27, 1901
Wm. Penrose Moore Apr 10, 1892